OK SB998 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water; waste prohibition; use of marginal water; requiring the Oklahoma Water Resources Board promulgate and implement certain rules. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water; waste prohibition; use of marginal water; requiring the Oklahoma Water Resources Board promulgate and implement certain rules. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-21Senatecoauthored by Hill
2019-05-15HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
2019-05-14SenateSCs named Murdock, Allen, Weaver, Quinn, Boren, Matthews
2019-05-13SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-05-08SenateMotion to adopt failed
2019-05-08SenateConsidered
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-03HouseTitle restored
2019-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Patzkowsky (principal House author)
2019-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb998&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB998%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB998%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB998%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB998%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB998%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB998%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB998%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB998%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB998%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB998_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB998_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback