OK SB996 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB996
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; subject requirements; including certain block course to units for mathematics and laboratory science. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; subject requirements; including certain block course to units for mathematics and laboratory science. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] |
Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2019-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB996 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle