OK SB993 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; defining short-term, limited-duration insurance; providing benefit limitations for certain policies. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; defining short-term, limited-duration insurance; providing benefit limitations for certain policies. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-14SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-14SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-13SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2019-05-13SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb993&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB993%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB993%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB993%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB993%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB993%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB993%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB993%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB993_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB993_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback