OK SB987 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishment; expanding crime of first degree murder. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishment; expanding crime of first degree murder. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Sen. Charles Wyrick [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-02 | coauthored by Ivester, Wyrick, Sparks | |
2012-05-02 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-03-27 | Title restored | |
2012-03-27 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2012-02-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | coauthored by Newell (principal House author) | |
2012-02-13 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2012-02-13 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |