OK SB984 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB984
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legal representation; modifying requirements for contracting for certain legal representation. Effective date.
Title
Legal representation; modifying requirements for contracting for certain legal representation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. George Burns [R] |
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 35 |
2022-04-27 | House | Amended |
2022-04-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Townley, Lepak, McBride, Martinez, Mize, McDugle, Burns, Grego |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB984 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Rules