OK SB981 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Property; relating to the Oklahoma Uniform Principal and Income Act; modifying procedures and adding definitions. Effective date.
Title
Property; relating to the Oklahoma Uniform Principal and Income Act; modifying procedures and adding definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | General Order | |
2009-04-09 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-05 | Title restored | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-03-05 | Backed up to General Order | |
2009-03-05 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley | |
2009-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 175 | 409 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 175 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |