OK SB979 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child support; modifying requirements for medical support orders. Effective date.
Title
Child support; modifying requirements for medical support orders. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ownbey (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |