OK SB972 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gross production taxes; modifying apportionment. Emergency.
Title
Gross production taxes; modifying apportionment. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-17 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6; Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 | |
2011-05-17 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | General Order | |
2011-05-16 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | First Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-05-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-13 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | coauthored by Sears, Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2011-05-11 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |