OK SB961 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB961
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; agriculture exemptions; modifying definitions; adding definition of game animals. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax exemption; agriculture exemptions; modifying definitions; adding definition of game animals. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-05-22 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2023-05-22 | Senate | SCs named Kidd, Bullard, Rader, Thompson (Roger), Gollihare, Pugh, Brooks |
2023-05-22 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-19 | House | Title restored |
2023-04-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dempsey (principal House author) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB961 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree