OK SB961 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB961
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Savings accounts; creating the Oklahoma Home Buyer Savings Account Act. Effective date.
Title
Savings accounts; creating the Oklahoma Home Buyer Savings Account Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment restores bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-17 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-17 | House | Amended |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB961 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019