OK SB953 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credits; modifying Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act; reducing carryforward for certain credits. Effective date.
Title
Tax credits; modifying Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act; reducing carryforward for certain credits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Died in GCCA |
2018-04-30 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2018-04-27 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2018-04-24 | House | General Order |
2018-04-03 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-03 | House | Title stricken |
2018-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |