OK SB951 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB951
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; modifying appointment procedure and membership of certain advisory committees; transferring certain duties. Emergency.
Title
Child care; modifying appointment procedure and membership of certain advisory committees; transferring certain duties. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Scott |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB951 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services