OK SB948 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB948
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting denial of dental coverage except in certain circumstances after prior authorization; adding supervised assistant behavior analyst to covered providers for treatment of autism spectrum disorder. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting denial of dental coverage except in certain circumstances after prior authorization; adding supervised assistant behavior analyst to covered providers for treatment of autism spectrum disorder. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/23/2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2019-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2019-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SCs named Rader, Quinn, Haste, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB948 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019