OK SB948 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; prohibiting denial of dental coverage except in certain circumstances after prior authorization; adding supervised assistant behavior analyst to covered providers for treatment of autism spectrum disorder. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; prohibiting denial of dental coverage except in certain circumstances after prior authorization; adding supervised assistant behavior analyst to covered providers for treatment of autism spectrum disorder. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateApproved by Governor 05/23/2019
2019-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateTitle restored
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-15SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Rader, Quinn, Haste, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
2019-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
2019-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb948&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB948%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB948%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB948%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB948%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB948%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB948%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB948%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB948_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB948_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback