OK SB947 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB947
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; requiring ballot title to contain notice of fiscal impact. Effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; requiring ballot title to contain notice of fiscal impact. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. Eric Roberts [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 18 |
2021-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Stark, Roberts (Eric) |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-03-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) |
2021-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB947 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021