OK SB932 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans and military; authorizing administrative leave for certain employees for volunteer service; criteria for leave. Effective date.
Title
Veterans and military; authorizing administrative leave for certain employees for volunteer service; criteria for leave. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |