OK SB924 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; directing audits of agencies requesting budget increases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; directing audits of agencies requesting budget increases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateFailed in Committee - Appropriations
2018-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Murphey (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
624512Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback