OK SB923 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB923
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hunting and fishing; creating a special use permit. Effective date.
Title
Hunting and fishing; creating a special use permit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Sen. Casey Murdock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Murdock |
2019-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Tadlock, West (Josh), Burns, Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-04-10 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB923 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019