OK SB919 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Narcotics and dangerous drugs; adding substances; electronic prescription method; OBNDD responsible for destruction of certain items. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Narcotics and dangerous drugs; adding substances; electronic prescription method; OBNDD responsible for destruction of certain items. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-13 Approved by Governor 05/13/2011
2011-05-09 Sent to Governor
2011-05-09 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-09 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-05 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-05 Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 4
2011-05-05 coauthored by Ivester
2011-05-05 HAs adopted
2011-04-13 HAs read
2011-04-13 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-12 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-12 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2011-04-12 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Ritze, Brown
2011-04-12 General Order
2011-03-31 Title restored
2011-03-31 Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders
2011-03-31 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2011-03-22 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-03-21 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed to House
2011-03-16 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-16 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2011-03-16 Title stricken
2011-03-16 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2011-03-01 coauthored by Derby (principal House author)
2011-03-01 Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-02-23 Referred to Public Safety
2011-02-23 Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
2011-02-23 Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
2011-02-14 Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Sykes
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5935324New CodeSee Bill Text
632204New CodeSee Bill Text
632206New CodeSee Bill Text
632208New CodeSee Bill Text
632210New CodeSee Bill Text
632212New CodeSee Bill Text
632309New CodeSee Bill Text
632415New CodeSee Bill Text
632508New CodeSee Bill Text
632701New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback