OK SB917 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Yen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Yen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; modifying time period during which credits based on certain federal credit amount may be claimed. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; modifying time period during which credits based on certain federal credit amount may be claimed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Yen |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Senator Fields |
2016-02-01 | Senate | coauthored by Quinn |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |