OK SB913 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-08SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Babinec (principal House author)
2018-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714111New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback