OK SB912 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Size, Weight, and Load; exempting certain agricultural vehicles from certain requirements; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Size, Weight, and Load; exempting certain agricultural vehicles from certain requirements; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by Governor 05/08/2018
2018-05-01SenateSent to Governor
2018-05-01HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-05-01SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-05-01HouseTo Senate
2018-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5
2018-05-01HouseCCR adopted
2018-04-26HouseCCR submitted
2018-04-26SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2018-04-26SenateCCR adopted
2018-04-25SenateEmergency added
2018-04-25SenateEnacting clause restored
2018-04-25SenateTitle restored
2018-04-25SenateCCR read
2018-04-23SenateSCs named Allen, Jech, Quinn, Rosino, Fry, Bass, Matthews
2018-04-23HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
2018-04-19SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2018-04-12SenateHAs read
2018-04-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5
2018-04-11HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-02HouseEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Transportation Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 0
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-27Senatecoauthored by Bennett (John)
2018-02-26Senatecoauthored by West (Rick)
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
2018-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
479531New CodeSee Bill Text
479532New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb912&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB912%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB912%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB912%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB912%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB912%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB912%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB912%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB912%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB912_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB912_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback