OK SB910 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; modifying language. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; modifying language. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2018-04-06HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2018-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2112908New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback