OK SB905 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons; repealing establishment of permanent trooper position. Effective date.
Title
Prisons; repealing establishment of permanent trooper position. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |