OK SB900 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; creating Prioritization of Public Funding in the Purchasing of Family Planning and Counseling Services Act. Effective date.
Title
Public health; creating Prioritization of Public Funding in the Purchasing of Family Planning and Counseling Services Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 12 |
2013-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby, Cockroft |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2013-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Standridge, Crain, Treat, David, Paddack, Burrage |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2013-04-17 | House | General Order |
2013-04-02 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 860 | New Code | See Bill Text |