OK SB890 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical procedure pricing; the creating Oklahoma Health Care Cost Reduction and Transparency Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical procedure pricing; the creating Oklahoma Health Care Cost Reduction and Transparency Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2018-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2018-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631725Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback