OK SB889 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sex offender registration; requiring certain recommendations; requiring additional registration requirement under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Sex offender registration; requiring certain recommendations; requiring additional registration requirement under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |