OK SB888 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Choices for Long-Term Care Act; requiring certain options counseling relating to admission to a long-term care facility. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Choices for Long-Term Care Act; requiring certain options counseling relating to admission to a long-term care facility. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateApproved by Governor 05/23/2019
2019-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 10
2019-05-20HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Hicks
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-16SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-16SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateTitle restored
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-05-08SenateSCs named David, Smalley, Simpson, Daniels, Hicks, Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
2019-04-24HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateTitle restored
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator David
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb888&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB888%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB888%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB888%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB888%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB888%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB888%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB888%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB888%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB888_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB888_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback