OK SB888 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; electric power produced by zero-emission facilities; eliminating refundability of tax credits. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; electric power produced by zero-emission facilities; eliminating refundability of tax credits. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenateDied in conference
2018-05-02SenateCCR read
2018-05-01HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2018-05-01SenateSCs named Allen, Brecheen, David, Quinn, Smalley, Pittman, Dossett
2018-05-01SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2018-04-30SenateHA's failed of adoption: Ayes: 18 Nays: 23
2018-04-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2018-04-26SenateHAs read
2018-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 46
2018-04-25HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2018-04-25HouseAmended
2018-04-25HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Silk, Dahm
2018-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dunlap, Faught, Gann, Strohm, ODonnell, McBride, West (Josh)
2018-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John)
2018-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2018-04-05HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2018-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2018-03-07SenateTitle restored
2018-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author)
2018-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-14SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6850010New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb888&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB888%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB888%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB888%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB888%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB888%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB888%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB888%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB888_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB888_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback