OK SB888 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; electric power produced by zero-emission facilities; eliminating refundability of tax credits. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; electric power produced by zero-emission facilities; eliminating refundability of tax credits. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Travis Dunlap [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Sen. Joseph Silk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2018-05-01 | Senate | SCs named Allen, Brecheen, David, Quinn, Smalley, Pittman, Dossett |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-30 | Senate | HA's failed of adoption: Ayes: 18 Nays: 23 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 46 |
2018-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-25 | House | Amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Silk, Dahm |
2018-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunlap, Faught, Gann, Strohm, ODonnell, McBride, West (Josh) |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |