OK SB885 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB885
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Insurance Business Plan Transfer Act; application procedures; reporting; court implementation order; business transfer. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; Insurance Business Plan Transfer Act; application procedures; reporting; court implementation order; business transfer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amended |
2019-04-16 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB885 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019