OK SB884 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB884
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying certain provisions regarding insurance reporting; modifying auditing provisions. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying certain provisions regarding insurance reporting; modifying auditing provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB884 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee