OK SB880 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Science, technology, engineering and mathematics education; modifying entity responsible for certain program. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Science, technology, engineering and mathematics education; modifying entity responsible for certain program. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-10 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2018-04-09 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |