OK SB878 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Used Tire Recycling Act; modifying used tire recycling fees; allocation to fund; unlawful transport. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Used Tire Recycling Act; modifying used tire recycling fees; allocation to fund; unlawful transport. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateApproved by Governor 05/09/2019
2019-05-06SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-06HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-02SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-02SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
2019-05-02SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-23SenateHAs read
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
2019-04-22HouseAmended
2019-04-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Fugate
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-01HouseEmergency restored
2019-04-01HouseTitle restored
2019-04-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Conley, McEntire
2019-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
2019-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-27SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb878&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB878%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB878%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB878%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB878%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB878%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB878%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB878%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB878%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB878_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB878_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback