OK SB868 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Agriculture; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Agricultural Program. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Agricultural Program. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-11SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-11HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Patzkowsky, Fetgatter
2019-04-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-01HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
2019-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Paxton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback