OK SB866 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of the State Medical Examiner; authorizing relocation to location determined by Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Emergency.
Title
Office of the State Medical Examiner; authorizing relocation to location determined by Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8; Ayes: 69 Nays: 9 |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-03-31 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2016-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |