OK SB861 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB861
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; requiring health benefit plans to administer certain coverage. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; requiring health benefit plans to administer certain coverage. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/04/2022 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB861 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson