OK SB861 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB861
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; requiring actions taken by insurers be consistent with certain standards. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; requiring actions taken by insurers be consistent with certain standards. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB861 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson