OK SB856 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB856
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Travel Reimbursement; exempting the Oklahoma Military Department. Effective date.
Title
State Travel Reimbursement; exempting the Oklahoma Military Department. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/25/2022 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-17 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Weaver, Dugger, Hall, Stephens, Haste, Floyd, Young |
2022-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee