OK SB854 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - General Order, considered and deferred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; powers and duties; creating a wildlife population survey. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; powers and duties; creating a wildlife population survey. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, considered and deferred
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback