OK SB852 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; sex offender registry restrictions. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; sex offender registry restrictions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Michael Schwartz [R] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | To Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 5 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-19 | Measure sent to House | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 | |
2011-05-19 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 | |
2011-05-19 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley | |
2011-05-19 | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 25 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency removed | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-12 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-11 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-27 | HAs read | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 10 | |
2011-04-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-03-29 | Title restored | |
2011-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | coauthored by Ivester, Sykes | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-23 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2011-02-17 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |