OK SB849 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB849
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Broadband Expansion Act; modifying requirements for assistance provided to the Office by certain agency; providing for hiring of certain personnel. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Broadband Expansion Act; modifying requirements for assistance provided to the Office by certain agency; providing for hiring of certain personnel. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2023-05-24 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-19 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-05-18 | Senate | SCs named Paxton, Garvin, Green, Haste, Kidd, Rader, Floyd |
2023-05-18 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-26 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2023-04-26 | House | Title restored |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Carry Over) 2023-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2023