OK SB841 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Prescription Access and Affordability Act; requiring retail pharmacy networks to comply with certain standards. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Prescription Access and Affordability Act; requiring retail pharmacy networks to comply with certain standards. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateVetoed 05/01/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Ranson
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey)
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Fugate
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Burns
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Bell
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Dills
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Roe
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Representative Phillips
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-22HouseWithdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-05SenateTitle restored
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General Order
2019-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback