OK SB84 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reading Sufficiency Act; extending probationary promotion for certain number of years. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading Sufficiency Act; extending probationary promotion for certain number of years. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateApproved by Governor 05/05/2017
2017-05-03SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-03HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-03SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-03SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-03SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-05-03SenateHAs adopted
2017-05-01SenateHAs read
2017-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
2017-04-27HouseEmergency added
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-04-27HouseRescind Third Reading
2017-04-27HouseRecalled from engrossment
2017-04-27HouseReturned from Senate
2017-04-27SenateMeasure sent to House
2017-04-27SenateHouse requested to return
2017-04-27HouseRequest to be returned by Senate
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2017-04-25HouseEmergency removed
2017-04-25HouseAmended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-04-25HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Stanislawski
2017-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Nollan
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2017-03-22SenateEmergency added
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Henke (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210508CNew CodeSee Bill Text
701210508GRepealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb84&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB84%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB84%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB84%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB84%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB84%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB84%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB84%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB84_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB84_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback