OK SB84 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which certain credits are allowed. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which certain credits are allowed. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2015-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-03-02SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Sharp
2015-02-26Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2015-02-10SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2015-02-09Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Mazzei
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
68235745New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback