OK SB834 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB834
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stolen property; establishing exception to certain valuation requirements; creating felony offense. Effective date.
Title
Stolen property; establishing exception to certain valuation requirements; creating felony offense. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb834&Session=1900 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB834%20INT.PDF |