OK SB828 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public utilities; modifying definition for public utilities relating to electricity transmission facilities. Emergency.
Title
Public utilities; modifying definition for public utilities relating to electricity transmission facilities. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Tibbs | |
2010-05-26 | 5 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Laid over | |
2010-05-25 | Considered | |
2010-05-24 | 5 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | 5 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | 5 CCR read | |
2010-05-21 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-21 | 4 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-20 | 4 CCR read | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | 3 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-05 | 3 CCR read | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named, naming same conferees: Blackwell, Thompson, Watson, Morgan, Walker, Johnson, Brannon, Kirby | |
2010-04-26 | SCs changed Marlatt, Bingman, Branan, Myers, Gumm to Marlatt, Bingman, Schulz, Branan, Ivester, Burrage | |
2010-04-26 | Further conference granted | |
2010-04-21 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-19 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2009-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-19 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2009-05-19 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2009-05-18 | 2 CCR read | |
2009-05-15 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-14 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2009-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-13 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-13 | coauthored by Schulz, Ivester | |
2009-05-13 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-11 | Title restored | |
2009-05-11 | CCR read | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named Blackwell, Thompson, Watson, Morgan, Walker, Johnson, Brannon, Kirby | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named Marlatt, Bingman, Branan, Myers, Gumm | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-16 | HAs read | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ortega, Walker | |
2009-04-15 | General Order | |
2009-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | coauthored by Garrison, Johnson (Constance), Burrage | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Branan | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Blackwell | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-12 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Branan | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 151 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 192 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |