OK SB826 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax credits; creating a credit for investment in qualified 100%- electric and plug-in hybrid electric vehicle related property; providing method for calculation; providing cap on credit. Contingent Effective Date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credits; creating a credit for investment in qualified 100%- electric and plug-in hybrid electric vehicle related property; providing method for calculation; providing cap on credit. Contingent Effective Date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateWithdrawn from Business and Commerce committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback