OK SB824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB824
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State highways; providing for certain economic impact study before highway projects proceed.
Title
State highways; providing for certain economic impact study before highway projects proceed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB824 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken