OK SB823 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB823
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; broadening criteria relating to certain alerts. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; broadening criteria relating to certain alerts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 19 |
2017-04-24 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-24 | House | Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Do Pass, pursuant to Committee Report by Signature |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB823 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - HAs read